Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mhc Whispering Pines Largo Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel M Hartzog, Jr, against Cummings, Lexis Ann, Gonzales, Michael Anthony, Mac Mahon, Luann Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
EXHIBIT CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY NOTICE OF EVICTION
Date: December 31, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAC MAHON, LUANN MARGARET / GONZALES, MICHAEL ANTHONY / CUMMINGS, LEXIS ANN Vol./Book 18712, Page 1903, 5 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT MICHAEL ANTHONY GONZALES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT LEXIS ANN CUMMINGS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT LUANN MARGARET MacMAHON
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 010414 MICHAEL ANTHONY GONZALES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010814 LUANN MARGARET MACMAHON
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 010414 LEXU ANN CUMMINGS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.