Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mobile Auto Glass Repair Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by John C Murrow, against Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Todd Gisclair, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL
Date: December 31, 2013(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 17, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 03, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND EMAIL
Date: January 28, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 03, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 03, 2014EXHIBIT INVOICE/ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS
Date: December 31, 2013INTERROGATORIES SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 07, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE/EMAIL
Date: July 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE/EMAIL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFENDANT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND EMAIL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.