Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Krzyzanowski, Eric, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Fino, Marc N, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA SHERIFF/HILLSBOROUGH Party: FINO, MARC N
Date: January 03, 2014COPY OF TIME LINE
Date: March 18, 2014ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO) Vol./Book 18348, Page 121, 2 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY OF TIME LINE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Party: FINO, MARC N
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE ALIAS SUMMONS TO GIVE TO YOUR PROCESS SERVER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.