Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tara Natasha Castillo, against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming Etc, Arrington Et Al, Jack A, Arrington Etc, Kathy, Arrington, Jack A, Arrington, Kathy, (total of 10) See All represented by Anthone R Damianakis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENSVol./Book 18277, Page 2231, 2 pages | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE BORROWER NONPART FORECLOSURE MEDIATIONAND CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION SET 060313 | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT30 DAYS | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVERParty: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES ETC | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRYParty: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES ETC | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRAL FORECLOSURE MEDIATION | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED021113Party: ARRINGTON, KATHY | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED021113Party: ARRINGTON ETC, KATHY | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED021113Party: ARRINGTON, JACK A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.