Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel G Drake, against Arce, Monica Rivera, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2009 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING Comment: ORDER APPROVING: JOINT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT EVICTION OR16756PG0708-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16756, Page 0708, 001 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE Comment: FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE: REQ RETN WRIT&CK/FAX; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED MONICA RIVERA ARCE //; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTND WRIT&CK/PER FAX REQUEST; VER: F; K
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CK; VER: N; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.