Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Scott A Griffith, against Amico, Kimberly, Barton, Darleny, Barton, Darrin D, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Owens, Benita, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17491PG0319-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17491, Page 0319, 001 pages | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $458.50; VER: N; P | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Realauction Electronic Sale Fee Paid $ Comment: REALAUCTION ELECTRONIC SALE FEE PAID $49.00; VER: N; P | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; VER: F; K | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SALE; VER: F; P | |
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SALE 013112 10:00; VER: F; P | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.