Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindsey Diehl, against Arnez, Ismael P, De, Arnez Cardine Monica Rojas, Homer, April, Homer, John, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17127PG2222-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17127, Page 2222, 001 pages | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Charged $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE CHARGED $770.70; VER: N; P | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Realauction Electronic Sale - Fee Charged $ Comment: REALAUCTION ELECTRONIC SALE FEE CHARGED $49.00; VER: N; P | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK NA; VER: F; K | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SALE; VER: F; P | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE Comment: ORD RESCHED ONLINE SALE FOR: 121310 OR17081PG0374-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17081, Page 0374, 002 pages | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 102210; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.