Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kevin Rudin, against Breaux, Jamie Lynn, Drake, Joshua Daniel, Drake, Justin Michael, Drake, Marilyn Marie, Florida State Of, (total of 7) See All represented by Sabrina E Solomon, W Eugene Gandy, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17516PG0482-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17516, Page 0482, 001 pages | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Realauction Electronic Sale Fee Paid $ Comment: REALAUCTION ELECTRONIC SALE FEE PAID $49.00; VER: N; P | |
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE WELLS FARGO BANK NA; VER: F; K | |
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | SALE SCHEDULED ONLINE Comment: SALE SCHEDULED ONLINE FOR: 022412 OR17461PG0727-008; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17461, Page 0727, 008 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.