Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindsey Diehl, against Rustin, Jimmy D, Rustin, Laura, Wachovia Bank National Association, represented by Gerald D Davis, Esq, Marshall G Reissman, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: TO: WELLS FARGO BANK NA C/O FLORIDA DEFAULT LAW; VER: N; A | |
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 897915 $193.12; VER: N; A | |
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: FOR: INTEREST WELLS FARGO V RUSTIN; VER: N; A | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE-RETD BY PO; VER: F; D | |
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MAILED TO JAYBIRD & PARTNERS; VER: N; K | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: FOR: AVAILABLE PROCEEDS WELLS FARGO V RUSTIN; VER: N; A | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: TO: WELLS FARGO BANK NA C/O FLORIDA DEFAULT; VER: N; A | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 893186 $251057.00; VER: N; A | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE Comment: COPY FAX COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE: AMENDED CERT OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SALE JAYBIRD AND PARTNERS INC(COPY); VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.