Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marc Marra, against Ball, Nicklaus W, Boca Sands Condominium Association Inc, Demos, Dave, Doe, John, Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Associaion, (total of 7) See All represented by Betty Rhodes Fitterman, Jon B Coats Jr, Esq, Monique E Parker, N Michael Kouskoutis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 25, 2014EXHIBIT B - MORTGAGE
Date: May 05, 2015MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN-ADMINISTRATOR-ATTORNEY A LITEM
Date: June 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21 2017 REPORT PUBLICATION DATE 07/28/17 | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE RETURN CHECK- RECORD FEE DUE | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19021, Page 1495, 1 pages | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE US BANK NA | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.