Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcclelland, Charles F Pr, Slawson Luella Mildred Estate Of, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Anthony Lance Reins, against Byrd, Turner M, Manorcare Health Services Inc, Manor Care Inc, Manor Care Of Palm Harbor, Wicks, Michele Ann, (total of 5) See All represented by Sally L Slaybaugh, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DEMERS, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEMERS, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR17028PG2367-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17028, Page 2367, 001 pages | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDUICE OR17027PG0106-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17027, Page 0106, 001 pages | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 090810; VER: F; P | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event | APPEAL DISMISSED Comment: APPEAL DISMISSED PER DCA ORDER; VER: F; P | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER Comment: DCA ORDER: APPEAL IS ABATED PENDING DISPOSITION BY SUPREME; VER: F; P | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE Comment: DCA ORDER: INITIAL BRIEF DUE 052410; VER: F; P | |
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE Comment: DCA ORDER: INITIAL BRIEF DUE 042610; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.