Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Taylor Christina, Brettnacher Sheila, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Charles R Gallagher Iii, Esq, against Del, Rio Debra Rose, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER Comment: ORDER CANCELING MEDIATION/PRETRIAL/TRIAL; VER: F; P | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO: DEBRA DE RIO; VER: F; P | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO ATTORNEY RE: CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION; VER: F; D | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION Comment: MTN CANCEL MEDIATION/PRE-TRIAL/TRIAL DUE TO BANKRUPTCY PRO; VER: F; D | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST Comment: PRE-TRIAL WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST; VER: F; D | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW; VER: F; P | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 121611; VER: F; P | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.