Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lasalle Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kimberly Anne Humphrey, against Bank Of America National Association, Copp, Geoni Dias, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 PER F.S. 43.19 FOR 2015
Date: November 23, 2015ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 43.19 Civil-2016
Date: November 30, 2016UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 43.19 / 2016
Date: April 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 43.19 / 2016 | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 43.19 Civil-2016 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 PER F.S. 43.19 FOR 2015 | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: INTEREST/W-9 FORM; VER: F; K | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MLD TO ROBERT BINDER; VER: F; K | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: FOR: AVAILABLE PROCEEDS LASALLE V DIAS; VER: N; A | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 870693 $74601.00; VER: N; A | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AS TO: Comment: TO: LASALLE BANK NA AS TRUSTEE C/O SHAPIRO & FISHMAN LLP; VER: N; A | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16768PG1343-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16768, Page 1343, 002 pages | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $522.90; VER: N; T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.