Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kimberly Anne Humphrey, against Westbrook, Lyshia, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Del, Rio Jose L, Deep Spring Community Association Inc, represented by Michael J Brudny, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORR FROM CLERK RE: RETURNING WRIT & CK NEED HEARING; VER: F; K | |
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO TENANT; VER: F; P | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: F; P | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16726PG1598-003; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16726, Page 1598, 003 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.