Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Henty, Evelyn, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jerry Theophilopoulos, Esq, against Decaire, Redgilisa, Hammond, Kimberley, represented by William K Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 082709 2:00; VER: F; D | |
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO; VER: F; P | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (2); VER: F; P | |
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2); VER: F; P | |
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO; VER: F; D | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; VER: F; D | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.