Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rice, Holly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott S Graul, Esq, against Guerra, Angel, Guerra, Patricia, represented by Nicholas D Zorn, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 120709; VER: F; P | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR16779PG0281-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16779, Page 0281, 001 pages | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL --- SETTLED; VER: F; P | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF DEATH Comment: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ANGEL GUERRA; VER: F; D | |
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION 081309; VER: F; P | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | RECEIVED BY COURT Comment: RECEIVED BY COURT 070209; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.