Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fifth Third Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Melissa R Rinaldi, against All Other Persons, Darring, Anna M, Darring, Rodney, Jackson, Kierra, Robinson, Farhonda, (total of 8) See All represented by Shawn M Yesner, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT A-CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: June 02, 2015NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION
Date: June 02, 2015CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES SERVED BELLEAIR PARTNERS LLC
Date: June 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES SERVED BELLEAIR PARTNERS LLC | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT MAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A-CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT BELLEAIR PARTNERS, LLC | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AFAINST ANNA M DARRING Vol./Book 17863, Page 1983, 2 pages | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 010213 | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 120612 @9:30 | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF PROPERTY APPRAISER REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.