Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fifth Third Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Melissa R Rinaldi, against Darring, Rodney W, Darring, Anna Marie, Baynham, Nedra, represented by Shawn M Yesner, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16902PG0329-003; VER: N; K Vol./Book 16902, Page 0329, 003 pages | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: C/C TITLE / MAILED 5/6/10 (CWS); VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE COMPANY; VER: F; K | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P | |
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Sale Scheduled In St Pete Comment: SALE SCHEDULED IN ST PETE FOR: 041210 OR16851PG1847-005; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16851, Page 1847, 005 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.