Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lopez, Susana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert T Joyce, against Gutierrez, Santiago J, Avila, Gabriel, represented by Evelio L Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR17042PG2197-001; VER: F; D Vol./Book 17042, Page 2197, 001 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 092110; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Comment: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION BY NON PARTY TO QUASH SUBPOENA; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.