Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haengel, Jeannette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Royce C Haddad, Jr, against Mendez, Roberto, represented by Reed H Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W DOUGLAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W DOUGLAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE OR16905PG0814-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16905, Page 0814, 001 pages | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO) Comment: DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG; VER: F; P | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION-ORDER Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER OF DISMISSAL; VER: F; P | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CONFERENCE 040610; VER: F; P | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 060910 10:30 /; VER: F; P | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | TRIAL WEEK OF Comment: TRIAL WEEK OF: 062110 8:30; VER: F; P | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 040610 2:15; VER: F; P | |
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Comment: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.