Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindsey Diehl, against Alves, Ana, Alves, Marcelo, Ana, Alves, Ana Regina M Revocable Living Trust Dated, Any And All Unknown Parties, (total of 7) See All represented by Julia B Kite-Powell, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Comment: RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT; VER: F; P | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Copy Of Receipt-Returned Orig Note Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE; VER: F; K | |
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED ORDER-JDG Comment: FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED: ORDER/JDG ALLAN(KENB); VER: N; K | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS CASE CANCEL SALE ETC; VER: F; P | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER W/ATTACHMENT; VER: F; P | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Comment: CLERK RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCS/SUBSTITUTE COPIES IN FILE/; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.