Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kimberly Anne Humphrey, against Tornatore, Santo, Imperial Cove Community Association Inc, Beauvais, Maureen L, Beauvais, Joseph A, All Unknown Parties, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17024PG1300-003; VER: R; K Vol./Book 17024, Page 1300, 003 pages | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $158.20; VER: N; P | |
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P | |
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COPY Comment: COPY CERTIFICATE OF SALE RETD BY PO; VER: F; D | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE JPMORGAN CHASE; VER: F; K | |
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.