Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Flagstar Bank F S B, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Darlene Fernandez Carus, against Kenneth City Social Club Inc, Easy A C And Water Condition, Bliss, Stephen E, Bliss, Rebecca S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16888PG1157-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16888, Page 1157, 001 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE FLAGSTAR BANK FSB; VER: F; K
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 020910 W/ATTACHMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
February 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Sale Scheduled In St Pete Comment: SALE SCHEDULED IN ST PETE FOR: 032410 OR16836PG0411-005; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16836, Page 0411, 005 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.