Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel G Drake, against Gonzalez, Andre, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2008 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR16128PG0567-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16128, Page 0567, 001 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED ANDRE GONZALEZ; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.