Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ducharme, Brenda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by J Stanford Morse, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE OR16482PG1907-001; VER: F; D Vol./Book 16482, Page 1907, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 012109; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL -SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; D
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 010909 AT 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIVED BY COURT Comment: RECEIVED BY COURT 102008; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.