Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Branch Banking And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stephanie L Davis, against Unknown Personal Representative Etc, Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantees, Mais, Samantha Marie Gick, Lake Valencia Homeowners Association Inc, Gick, Christopher R, (total of 6) See All represented by Eric Leonard Bolves, Laura L Walker, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLAN, LINDA R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR17063PG1452-003; VER: R; P Vol./Book 17063, Page 1452, 003 pages
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $875.70; VER: N; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE BRANCH BANKING; VER: F; K
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL COUNT II; VER: F; P
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Sale Scheduled In Clearwater Comment: SALE SCHEDULED IN CLEARWATER FOR: 081810 OR16979PG2257-006; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16979, Page 2257, 006 pages
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.