Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stephanie L Davis, against Mahoney, Margaret, Mahoney, Elzie, represented by Jason M Kral, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16883PG1289-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16883, Page 1289, 002 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE-RETD BY PO; VER: F; D
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE AURORA LOAN SERVICING; VER: F; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Comment: NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Sale Scheduled In St Pete Comment: SALE SCHEDULED IN ST PETE FOR: 032210 OR16827PG0159-006; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16827, Page 0159, 006 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.