Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
St Petersburg Police Department, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Scott A Headley, against Williams, Dean P, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORRIS, ROBERT J, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE OR16217PG1681-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16217, Page 1681, 001 pages
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: F; K
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT PETITION FORFEITURE Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT PETITION FORFEITURE; VER: F; P
Judge: MORRIS, ROBERT J, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.