Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martenfeld, Edward G, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Samuel J Heller, Esq, against Synovus Bank Of Tampa Bay, Martenfeld, Mark, Hunters Landscaping And Lawn Maintenance Inc, Goodman, Rebecca L, represented by Rabian M Brooks, Iii, Elihu H Berman, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21 PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 116.21
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE DESTROYED Comment: PLTF & DEFT EVIDENCE DESTROYED; VER: N; K
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE Comment: INTENT TO DESTROY EVIDENCE SENT TO PLTF & DEFT ATTYS; VER: F; K
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: COPY MOTION FOR COMMENCEMENT OF PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT AND RELEASE OF LIEN; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 050511; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR17268PG1445-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 17268, Page 1445, 001 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.