Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mercantile Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roger A Kelly, against Any Unknown Party Who May Claim As Heir Etc, Florida State Of, Jackson, Gerald, Jackson, Natalie, Jackson, Robert Lee, (total of 9) See All represented by Richard B Badgley, Tompkins A Foster, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 1 DESTROYED FILE LETTER
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 2 VIA EMAIL TO CIVILCERT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE RE: DEMOLITION VIOLATION NOTICE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE DEMOLITION VIOLATION NOTICE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Vol./Book 17873, Page 285, 2 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 012513 9:45
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 110212 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.