Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
F A K Enterprises Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by C Stephen Allen, against Scherer, Cathy, Mangels, Christine, Investors Title Llc, Grenier, Glenn, Doe, John, (total of 5) See All represented by David L Schrader, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McGRADY, J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGRADY, J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: F; K
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16329PG2559-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16329, Page 2559, 001 pages
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE F A K ENTERPRISES INC; VER: F; K
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Sale/Copy To Gulf Coast Bus Rev Comment: NOTICE OF SALE/COPY TO GULF COAST BUS REV; VER: F; K
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Sale Scheduled In St Pete Comment: SALE SCHEDULED IN ST PETE FOR: 070908 OR16283PG1731-003; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16283, Page 1731, 003 pages
Judge: McGRADY, J THOMAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.