Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Accredited Home Lenders Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lewis Niad, against Unknown Spouse Of Chi Kim Le, Le, Chi Kim, Davis, Teresa, Bain, Mario, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16264PG1926-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16264, Page 1926, 001 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.