Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Benjamin J Herst, against Townhouses Of Bardmoor Inc No 1 A Condominium, Sanders, Bonnie Lee, Sanders, Bernard R, Amsouth Bank, represented by Robert L Tankel, Esq, J Andrew Baldwin, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16506PG1467-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16506, Page 1467, 001 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY PROOF OF PUBLICATION; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT RE-NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.