Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tia Gibbs, against Caraldo, Justin, Fremont Investment And Loan, Hildebrandt, Michael, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Roberts, Meagan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Comment: RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
COPY OF RECEIPT-RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG; VER: F; K
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR16880PG1525-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16880, Page 1525, 001 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Comment: ORDER VACATING: JUDGMENT/RELEASING ORIGINAL; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECD BY COURT 033010; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: TO DISMISS CASE/VACATE JUDGMENT ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/DISMISS CAE=SE/; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: F; P
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.