Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wyckoff, Michael, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Rodber, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2007 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR16123PG0859-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16123, Page 0859, 001 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: AND SIGNED MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE NO DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: LETTER FROM CLERK RE: NO DEFAULT ENTERED /NEED NONMILITARY; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I (UNSIGNED); VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.