Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Laney, Patricia Jean, Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST ARNOLD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST ARNOLD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2006 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (04-014) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MCCOOL JAMES A OR15837PG2126-002; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15837, Page 2126, 002 pages
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NO SERVICE ATTD; VER: F; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: MCCOOL JAMES A; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY 000000 MAILE Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK SERVICE) BY: 052807 MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED JAMES A MCCOOL; VER: F; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons W/Copy Petition Attd To: Comment: SUMMONS W/COPY PETITION ATTD TO: PAULSON AGENCY; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.