Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hall, Theadare, Florida State Of Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hall, Theadare S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FEDERICO, PHILIP J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFEDERICO, PHILIP J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2006 |
CategoryIv-D Support |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
TEXT BALANCE ADJUSTMENT SHEET
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOR DEPOSITORY COLLECTIONS CREDIT
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW Comment: JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERKS ARREARAGE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT Comment: CLERKS ARREARAGE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS Comment: NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS COPY; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Comment: ARREARS CALCULATION SCREEN; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN OR16528PG1924-001; VER: F; K Vol./Book 16528, Page 1924, 001 pages
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ARREARS Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ARREARS CERTIFIED; VER: F; K
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: TERMINATION OF PARENTAL RIGHTS; VER: F; P
Judge: FEDERICO, PHILIP J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.