Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Bernice Haynes, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Ruffers John, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR15635PG1405-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15635, Page 1405, 001 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-RECOMMENDATIONS OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: FINDINGS/RECOMMEND. OF GENER. MAGISTRATE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: SECOND PAGE OF A FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 020907 10:00 PRO-SE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MASTER; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Comment: WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.