Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patti, Mario, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Paul Puzzanghera, Esq, against Kash N Karry Food Stores Inc, represented by Jennifer A Simon, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryNegligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY CT 081607; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF W/PREJUDICEF OR15941PG1407-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 15941, Page 1407, 001 pages
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL - SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Comment: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; VER: F; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; VER: N; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Comment: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.