Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
World Savings Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case represented by Robert L Wunker, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 052907 9:00 (TELEPHONE); VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED - GE MONEY BANK; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED GE MONEY BANK 022007; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED GE MONEY BANK 022007; VER: F; K | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED JOSEPH H COUCH III / LYNN J COUCH; VER: N; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.