Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
R-G Crown Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jennifer A Sesta, against United States Of America, Regions Bank, Debella, Thomas A, Debella, Mary Beth, Any Unknown Spouse Of Said Defendants, (total of 6) See All represented by John F Rudy, Iii, John G Bianco, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
RELEASE-DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: RELEASE OF RIGHT OF REDEMPTION; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES SENT EMAIL 9/28/07 (SM); VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY W/CERT COPY; VER: N; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15883PG1272-003; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15883, Page 1272, 003 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $1050.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE R-G CROWN BANK; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.