Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guzik, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ted E Karatinos, against Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Patrizia S Delgado, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKHOUZAM, NELLY N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO SERVED (2); VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA FOR NON-PARTY RECORDS / SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
TRIAL WEEK OF Comment: TRIAL WEEK OF: 041408; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL-ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE TRIAL/ORDER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 040708 3:00; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Comment: MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.