Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mccaughna, Christopher, Mccaughna Eric Estate Of, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Nicole M Ziegler, against Galasti, Edward A, represented by Guillermo A Ruiz, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES - SERVED
Date: September 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO AND DEFT EDWARD A GALASTI Vol./Book 19027, Page 752, 2 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 12/17/15 9:30
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT (D) AMENDED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT (C) AMENDED ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT (B) NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT (A) ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.