Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1St Palm Financial Services L L C, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gregg S Ahrens, against Doe, John, Kreutzberg, Rhonda, Renda, Mark A, Unknown Spouse Of Mark A Renda, Unknown Spouse Of Rhonda Kreutzberg, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $6.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICOR15598PG2631-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 15598, Page 2631, 001 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: RHONDA RENDA PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF-AS DESIGNATED Comment: ANSWER OF/AS DESIGNATED: MARK A RENDA; VER: N; D
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARK A RENDA; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED RHONDA KREUTZBERG 122706; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RHONDA KREUTZBERG; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.