Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marisol Morales, against Heape, Jeffrey N, Heape, Stephanie, Lexington National Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUESADA, FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $5.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR15635PG1468-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15635, Page 1468, 001 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING 021507 AT 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RE NO DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: LETTER FROM CLERK RE: NO DEFAULT ENTERED; VER: N; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 012607; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED - STEPHANIE HEAPE / JEFFREY N HEAPE /; VER: N; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.