Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Susan Yeong J Kang, against Wade, Novella, Sutton, Lynne M, Sutton, Brian J, Orange Lake Village Homeowners Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Comment: RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Copy Of Receipt-Returned Orig Note Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE; VER: N; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY Comment: CERTIFICATE TITLE MLD PLTF(S) ATTORNEY; VER: N; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; T
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15719PG2442-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15719, Page 2442, 001 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST; VER: F; K
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.