Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bankhead, Bettina, Bankhead, Williams, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joel P Yanchuck, Esq, against Harr, Kim, represented by Douglas D Underwood, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRONDOLINO, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2006 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment: FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OR17333PG2148-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17333, Page 2148, 001 pages
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 081811; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-MEDIATED SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG (SRS DISPO) Comment: DISMISSED/MEDIATED SETTLEMENT BEFORE HRG; VER: N; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIP-ORDER Comment: JOINT STIP/ORDER FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF: ANSWERS SURVEILLANCE/EXPERT INTERROGATORI; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Comment: LIST OF POTENTIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBITS; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
LIST OF EXHIBITS Comment: LIST OF EXHIBITS; VER: F; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Comment: WITNESS LIST AND; VER: N; D
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE EXPERT INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P
Judge: RONDOLINO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.