Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel G Drake, against Autenrieth, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDRINGA, HENRY J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2006 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT 1 POSSESSION OR15244PG0730-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15244, Page 0730, 001 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.