Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Rhonda, Marshall, Steven, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joel P Yanchuck, Esq, against Hurst, Deborah, represented by Charles E Mckeon, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOGAN, WALTER D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2006 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL EXECUTION OF AUTHORIZATION; VER: F; D
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF STEVEN MARSHALL; VER: F; D
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES AND; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Comment: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY 020507; VER: F; D
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.