Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Misiak-Mackay, Yvonne M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morgan-Mackay, Stephen B, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ST ARNOLD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeST ARNOLD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES / MLD 7/25/08 (SM); VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES DONE TSO 080706; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: RECOMMEND OF GENER. MAGISTRATE; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14951PG0651-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14951, Page 0651, 001 pages
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MASTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 020306 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: ST ARNOLD, JACK R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.